Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB186
Introduced on: Feb 27, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin , Kirkpatrick , Oceguera , Horne , Parks , Anderson , Arberry , Bobzien , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Gerhardt , Hogan , Kihuen , Koivisto , Leslie , McClain , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Womack
Revises various provisions relating to economic and energy development. (BDR 32-784)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 493.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 05, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      To Subcommittee .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 19, 2007     05:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 05, 2007     06:45 PM    Minutes       .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun. 01, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun. 02, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 28   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 29   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 281
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1043
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1062

Bill History

Feb 27, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 281.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.

May 28, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1043.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • Action of passage rescinded.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • To printer.

May 29, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1062.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 30, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 493.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo