Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB196
Introduced on: Feb 27, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Marvel , Mabey , Arberry , Settelmeyer
Makes changes concerning the limitation on the total proposed expenditures of the State. (BDR 31-946)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Bill became law pursuant to Nevada Constitution Article 4, Section 35.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 28, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Finance     May. 21, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     Jun. 03, 2007     10:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 11   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 04   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1153

Bill History

Feb 27, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.

May 14, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1153.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1153 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 18, 2007

  • Chapter 543.
  • (Bill became law pursuant to Nevada Constitution Article 4, Section 35.)
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo