Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB207
Introduced on: Feb 27, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera
Revises provisions governing vocational rehabilitation services. (BDR 53-546)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 13, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 442

Bill History

Feb 27, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 442.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo