Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB209
Introduced on: Feb 28, 2007
By: Taxation
Makes various changes regarding the imposition and administration of property taxes. (BDR 32-469)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 415.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Taxation     May. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     May. 10, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 458
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 994
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 997

Bill History

Feb 28, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 458.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 994 and 997.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2007

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 994 and 997 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 415.
  • Sections 27, 29, and 30 of this act effective June 13, 2007. Sections 1 to 13, inclusive, 15, 19 to 23, inclusive, 25 and 26 of this act effective July 1, 2007. Sections 15 and 23 of this act expire by limitation December 31, 2007. Sections 14, 16, 17, 18, 24 and 28 of this act effective January 1, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo