Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB210
Introduced on: Feb 28, 2007
By: Taxation
Revises provisions governing certain exemptions from and refunds of property taxes. (BDR 32-470)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 457

Bill History

Feb 28, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 457.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo