Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB221
Introduced on: Feb 28, 2007
By: Government Affairs
Authorizes a board of county commissioners, under certain circumstances, to provide a civil penalty in lieu of a criminal penalty for the violation of certain ordinances. (BDR 20-354)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 28, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 06, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 28, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo