Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB180
Introduced on: Feb 28, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers , Washington , Gansert , Cobb , Goedhart , Hardy , Settelmeyer , Stewart
Provides the registered owner of a vehicle with the opportunity to make a voluntary contribution to the State Highway Fund at the time of the renewal of the registration. (BDR 43-696)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar. 15, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Without recommendation and rerefer .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 11, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .   Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Transportation     May. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     May. 17, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do Pass, failed .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 527

Bill History

Feb 28, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 19, 2007

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 527.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo