Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB227
Introduced on: Mar 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carpenter , Mabey , Claborn , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Marvel , Settelmeyer , Rhoads , McGinness
Revises the provisions governing the posting of warnings against trespassing. (BDR 15-702)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 26, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 103
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 697

Bill History

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 02, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 103.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 30, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 01, 2007

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 14, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 697.) To printer.

May 16, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 697 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo