Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB228
Introduced on: Mar 01, 2007
By: Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining
Revises provisions governing licenses to engage in pest control. (BDR 49-626)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar. 26, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 16, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 16, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 05   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 849

Bill History

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 02, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 29, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 02, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 03, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 05, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.

Apr 09, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 849.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 849 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.
  • Effective January 1, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo