Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB232
Introduced on: Mar 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie , Buckley , Horne , McClain , Oceguera , Allen , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Beers , Bobzien , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Hogan , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Mabey , Manendo , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Wiener , Titus , Care , Coffin , Lee , McGinness , Nolan , Schneider , Woodhouse
Provides for certain information relating to pharmacies and the prices of commonly prescribed prescription drugs to be made available to consumers. (BDR 40-856)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 05, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 09, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2007     02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun. 01, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Jun. 02, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun. 01   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 480
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1104
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1132

Bill History

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 02, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 480.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 01, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1104.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1132.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1132 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.
  • Sections 9 and 14 of this act effective June 14, 2007. Sections 1 to 8, inclusive, 10, 11 and 12 of this act effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo