Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB233
Introduced on: Mar 01, 2007
By: Government Affairs
Increases the number of members of the Commission on Mental Health and Developmental Services. (BDR 18-625)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 01, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 05, 2007     10:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.158

Bill History

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 02, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 158.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo