Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB235
Introduced on: Mar 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien , Buckley , Conklin , Leslie , McClain , Kihuen , Koivisto , Manendo , Parks , Segerblom , Smith
Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 54-980)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 30, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 16, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 23   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 135

Bill History

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 02, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 135.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 18, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 17, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 22, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 24, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 25, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 203.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo