Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB197
Introduced on: Mar 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener , Titus , Care , Coffin , Lee , McGinness , Nolan , Schneider , Woodhouse , Leslie , Buckley , Horne , McClain , Oceguera , Allen , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Beers , Bobzien , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Mabey , Manendo , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith
Requires the State Board of Pharmacy to make available to consumers certain information relating to pharmacies and the prices of commonly prescribed prescription drugs. (BDR 54-67)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 02, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 05, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo