Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB23
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2007
By: Judiciary
Revises the penalty for placing graffiti on or otherwise defacing property. (BDR 15-436)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 12, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Jan 26, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 29, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo