Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB202
Introduced on: Mar 05, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Washington
Makes various changes relating to domestic relations. (BDR 11-215)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 465.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 20, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 21, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 18, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2007     10:30 AM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.164
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.890

Bill History

Mar 05, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 06, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 164.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 24, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 890.) To printer.

May 25, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 890 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 465.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo