Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB208
Introduced on: Mar 05, 2007
By: Judiciary
Makes various changes to provisions governing employees who are summoned to appear for jury duty. (BDR 1-660)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 62.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 14, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 07   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Mar 05, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 06, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 20, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 30, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 03, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 07, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.

May 08, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 11, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 17, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 62.
  • Effective May 17, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo