Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
ACR9
Introduced on: Mar 02, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford , Anderson , Goedhart , Hardy , Hogan , Kihuen , Manendo , Stewart
Urges the Commission on Economic Development , regional economic development authorities and local redevelopment agencies to promote economic development and urban renewal and to stimulate employment in certain areas. (BDR R-191)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 47.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and be adopted as amended .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 25, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 64

Bill History

Mar 02, 2007

  • Resolution read and adopted. To printer.

Mar 05, 2007

  • From printer. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 64.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Resolution read and adopted, as amended. To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 64 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 47.
  • This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo