Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB238
Introduced on: Mar 02, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Koivisto , Parks , Anderson , Atkinson , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Hogan , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , McClain , Mortenson , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Womack
Provides for the regulation of tanning establishments by the State Board of Cosmetology. (BDR 54-969)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 531

Bill History

Mar 02, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 05, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 531.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
  • Notice of reconsideration on next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Action reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo