Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB240
Introduced on: Mar 02, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Koivisto , McClain , Claborn , Parks , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Beers , Bobzien , Conklin , Grady , Hogan , Horne , Manendo , Mortenson , Segerblom , Weber , Womack
Provides for the impoundment of motor vehicles in certain situations. (BDR 43-973)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 514

Bill History

Mar 02, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 05, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 514.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo