Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB242
Introduced on: Mar 02, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mabey , Parnell
Requires the State Board of Health to adopt regulations requiring the immunization against meningococcal disease of certain students who are enrolled in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 40-357)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 26, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Education     Apr. 02, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Education     Apr. 04, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.178

Bill History

Mar 02, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 05, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 178.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo