Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB243
Introduced on: Mar 05, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parnell , Smith , Denis , Buckley , Kihuen , Koivisto , McClain
Provides for reduction of certain excise taxes payable by employers that make donations to public schools. (BDR 32-117)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 03, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 216

Bill History

Mar 05, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 06, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 216.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo