Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB211
Introduced on: Mar 05, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus , Wiener , Care , Coffin , Lee , Mathews , Schneider , Woodhouse , Parks , Oceguera , Arberry , Manendo , Buckley , Anderson , Atkinson , Bobzien , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Womack
Authorizes deductions from the state taxes on financial institutions and other businesses for certain expenditures by employers for the provision of day care to the children of their employees. (BDR 32-676)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 408

Bill History

Mar 05, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 06, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 408.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo