Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB247
Introduced on: Mar 05, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley
Makes various changes concerning billing for, collecting and bringing actions and enforcing judgments for delinquent payments for hospital care rendered at a hospital. (BDR 40-819)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 05, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 26, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 28, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 30, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 18, 2007     11:10 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 124
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 937

Bill History

Mar 05, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 937.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 937 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
  • Section 10 and 12 of this act effective June 4, 2007. Sections 1 to 9, inclusive, and section 11 of this act effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo