Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB26
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2007
By: Judiciary
Revises certain provisions governing the filing of certain organizing documents for corporations and other business entities. (BDR 7-549)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 13, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 06, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Feb. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Jan 26, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 29, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 16, 2007

  • Read second time.

Feb 19, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Feb 21, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Mar 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 13, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Mar 16, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Mar 20, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
  • Effective March 20, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo