Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB248
Introduced on: Mar 06, 2007
By: Judiciary
Makes various changes to provisions governing gaming. (BDR 41-383)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 28, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 02, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 17   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 634

Bill History

Mar 06, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 07, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.)
  • Notice of reconsideration on next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Action reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 01, 2007

  • Withdrawn from committee.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo