Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB231
Introduced on: Mar 07, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Heck
Revises provisions relating to confidentiality of contents of prescriptions. (BDR 54-524)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Subcommittee .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 26, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Discussed in Subcommittee .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 02, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 9,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 131

Bill History

Mar 07, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 08, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 131.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 9, Nays: 12.)

Apr 25, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo