Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR6
Introduced on: Mar 07, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson , Buckley , Horne , Allen , Oceguera , Anderson , Arberry , Beers , Bobzien , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Cobb , Conklin , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Mabey , Manendo , Marvel , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Smith , Stewart , Weber , Womack , Nolan , Amodei , Beers , Care , Carlton , Cegavske , Hardy , Heck , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Raggio , Rhoads , Schneider , Titus , Townsend , Washington , Wiener , Woodhouse
Urges Congress to repeal the REAL ID Act of 2005. (BDR R-1393)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 70.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb. 22, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Apr. 10, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 08, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar. 28   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 03   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.661

Bill History

Mar 07, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 08, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 21, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 22, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Mar 29, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 01, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 02, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 661.) To printer.

May 03, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 07, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 11, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 661 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 14, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 70.
  • Effective May 14, 2007

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo