Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB257
Introduced on: Mar 12, 2007
By: Taxation
Authorizes the Board of County Commissioners of Nye County to increase the sales tax to support public safety services. (BDR S-137)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 22, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 29, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 9,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 148
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 399

Bill History

Mar 12, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 13, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 148 and 399.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 9, Nays: 12.)

Apr 25, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo