Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB279
Introduced on: Mar 09, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kihuen , Parks , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Beers , Bobzien , Buckley , Claborn , Cobb , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Hogan , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Womack , Carlton , Care , Titus , Horsford , Lee , Woodhouse
Requires a certain portion of the unused value of certain gift certificates to escheat to the State. (BDR 52-961)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 11, 2007     12:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 15   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 533
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 672

Bill History

Mar 09, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 12, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 533.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 10, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 14, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 672.) To printer.

May 15, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.

May 16, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 672 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

May 17, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo