Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB34
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions governing unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-610)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 30.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 19, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar. 29   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Jan 26, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 29, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 29, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 02, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Apr 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 30, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 01, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 03, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 10, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 30.
  • Effective May 10, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo