Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB281
Introduced on: Mar 13, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions governing industrial insurance. (BDR 53-1136)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 20, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 02, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 05, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 197

Bill History

Mar 13, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 14, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 197.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo