Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB326
Introduced on: Mar 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mortenson
Revises provisions relating to buildings constructed of unreinforced masonry. (BDR 28-716)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: None, Nays: 41, Excused: 1.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 06, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 11, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 14, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun. 02   Yea 0,   Nay 41,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 366

Bill History

Mar 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 366.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 25, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Vetoed by the Governor.
  • Returned to Assembly.
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: None, Nays: 41, Excused: 1.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo