Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB334
Introduced on: Mar 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith
Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-413)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 28, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Education     Apr. 09, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 25, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 16, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Jun. 01, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 253
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 814

Bill History

Mar 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 253.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 814.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 814 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo