Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB295
Introduced on: Mar 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider
Provides for the regulation of the price of gasoline and diesel fuel. (BDR 51-1170)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 26, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 11, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 13, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amendment proposed, failed .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo