Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB18
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions governing deceptive trade practices. (BDR 52-587)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 14, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Feb. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 709
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 977

Bill History

Jan 26, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 29, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 19, 2007

  • Read second time.

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Feb 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 709.) To printer.

May 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 977.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 26, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 709 and 977 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 709 and 977 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo