Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB356
Introduced on: Mar 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin , Anderson , Atkinson , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Oceguera , Parks , Titus
Revises provisions governing partial abatements of certain taxes. (BDR 32-783)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 05, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo