Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB20
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions governing claims against subsequent injury accounts. (BDR 53-562)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 126.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 06, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 07, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 13, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 20, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 10   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 16   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 25

Bill History

Jan 26, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 29, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 25.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 12, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 17, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 126.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo