Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB374
Introduced on: Mar 16, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera
Requires the Department of Transportation to construct and operate permanent port of entry inspection stations. (BDR 35-930)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 22, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 29, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 16, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 19, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 25, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 02, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 03, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 05, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo