Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB396
Introduced on: Mar 16, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne , Allen , Parks , Gerhardt , Hardy , Schneider , Heck
Makes various changes to the provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-1284)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 12, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 13, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 18, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      Do not recede .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 388
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 910
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 978
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1002
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1024
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA19

Bill History

Mar 16, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 19, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 388.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 25, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 978, 1002 and 1024.)
  • Amendment No. 1015 withdrawn.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 910, 978, 1002 and 1024 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 910, 978, 1002 and 1024 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment Nos. 910, 978, 1002 and 1024 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo