Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB5
Introduced on: Dec 11, 2006
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Heck , Horsford , Mathews , Nolan , Washington , Wiener , Woodhouse
Requires the establishment of the Cancer Drug Donation Program. (BDR 40-19)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Feb. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 25, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 18, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 6
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 934

Bill History

Dec 11, 2006

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Dec 13, 2006

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 6.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 934.) To printer.

May 23, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 934 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 30, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 934 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo