Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB404
Introduced on: Mar 16, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith , Parks , Conklin , Leslie , Anderson , Arberry , Beers , Buckley , Gansert , Gerhardt , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , McClain , Oceguera , Parnell , Pierce , Settelmeyer
Revises provisions governing the use of credit information by insurers. (BDR 57-1335)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 218.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 857

Bill History

Mar 16, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 19, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 857.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 857 not concurred in.

May 28, 2007

  • Action of refusal to concur in Senate Amendment No. 857 rescinded.
  • Senate Amendment No. 857 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 218.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo