Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB308
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton
Proposes to authorize the Legislature to prescribe temporary exemptions from sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-138)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo