Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB311
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services to establish a system that allows applications for Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program to be submitted electronically. (BDR 38-606)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Mar. 27, 2007     06:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Finance     May. 04, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 29, 2007

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Mar 30, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo