Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB324
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: Taxation
Revises provisions governing regulation of motor vehicle fuel. (BDR 51-1139)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 425.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 29, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer .
  Senate Finance     Jun. 02, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 5-29-07 .   Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Jun. 04, 2007     12:02 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun. 04   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 438
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1135

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 438.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1135.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 425.
  • Effective June 13, 2007 for the purpose of adopting regulations, and October 1, 2007 for all other purposes.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo