Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB325
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers , Heck , Cegavske , Hardy , Lee , Beers , Hardy , Cobb , Goedhart , Grady , Marvel
Makes various changes concerning the English language. (BDR 19-760)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 06, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 11, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 13, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.414

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 414.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo