Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB346
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: Finance
Makes an appropriation to the Office of the Director of the Department of Health and Human Services to fund a working group to study the methamphetamine problem in Nevada for the current fiscal year. (BDR S-1201)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 220.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 08, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Senate Finance     May. 17, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 24, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 26   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 693

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 693.) To printer.

May 16, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 17, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 220.
  • Effective May 31, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo