Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB34
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2007
By: Judiciary
Makes various changes to provisions concerning protective orders. (BDR 15-656)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 13, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 19, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Feb. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 01   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Jan 26, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 29, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

Feb 19, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Feb 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 25, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 26, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 30, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 01, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 02, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 03, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 08, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo