Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB379
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy
Enacts the Motor Vehicle Owners' Right to Repair Act. (BDR 52-1320)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Apr. 05, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo