Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB460
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Koivisto , Parks , Parnell , Beers , Atkinson , Bobzien , Buckley , Carpenter , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , Mabey , Manendo , Marvel , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Smith , Stewart , Weber , Womack
Revises provisions regarding public schools and educational personnel. (BDR 34-1279)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 436.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr. 02, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Education     Apr. 09, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 01, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 23, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 25, 2007     11:48 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 21   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 254
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 765
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 995

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committees.

Mar 25, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Education: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 254.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.

May 16, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 765.) To printer.

May 18, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.

May 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 24, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 995.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 995 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 995 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Recede from Senate Amendment No. 995. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 436.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo