Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB381
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: Judiciary
Authorizes the Chairman of the State Gaming Control Board to allow abatements of certain license fees paid by certain gaming licensees. (BDR 41-1130)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 06, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 22, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 28, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 30   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 565
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1054

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 565.)
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1054.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo